TEIGNBRIDGE HOMELESS ACTION TODAY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THAT as well as providing food/toiletry packs and clothes/sleeping bags to the homeless in Teignbridge, operates the Newton Abbot and Teignbridge food bank providing food and toiletry and moving in packs to individuals and families in crisis. This is operated with a voucher system. Vouchers are issued from doctors, schools, DWP, local authority, housing associations etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 27 March 2012: Standard registration
- 21 October 2022: Funds received from 1141844 KINGSKERSWELL SUMMER MOON TRUST
- THAT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher James Hanson | Chair | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Henri Jacqueline Treece | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Joan Wood | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Patterson | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Harrison | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Reginald Harold North | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.39k | £64.01k | £62.89k | £53.26k | £35.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.10k | £17.38k | £31.32k | £44.76k | £46.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2024
(These accounts |
20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1)TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIS HABITABLE STANDARDS); CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). (2)TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF ADDICTION TO DRUGS AND ALCOHOL, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 8
Queensway House
Queensway
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ12 4BA
- Phone:
- 01626 437310
- Email:
- office@thatfoodbank.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window