NEWBORNS VIETNAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The reduction of neonatal mortality in South East Asia; with a specific focus on advancing neonatal care, through capacity building, including doctor, midwife and nurse training, through long-term partnerships with local public health providers. The provision of basic and specialist medical equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambodia
- Indonesia
- Laos
- Vietnam
Governance
- 07 November 2011: Standard registration
- NBV (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Campbell | Trustee | 05 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ngoc Long Nguyen | Trustee | 05 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Charles Reimann | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Poon | Trustee | 04 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hoanh Tien Nguyen | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bang Trinh | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr DUNCAN JOHN MACRAE | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICK ROBINSON | Trustee | 07 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNA ELAINE LUBRAN | Trustee | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £422.35k | £322.71k | £330.21k | £460.17k | £215.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £459.40k | £285.12k | £277.76k | £546.74k | £417.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 SEP 2011
Charitable objects
"THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO SAVE LIVES, BY REDUCING NEONATAL MORTALITY AND PROMOTING THE HEALTH OF NEWBORN CHILDREN AND THEIR MOTHERS IN COUNTRIES WITH HIGH LEVELS OF NEONATAL MORTALITY AND ILLNESS AND IN PARTICULAR SOUTH EAST ASIA".
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
35 St. Paul's Square
Birmingham
- Phone:
- 01392770108
- Email:
- info@newbornsvietnam.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window