Financial history THE GATEHAMPTON TRUST

Charity number: 1144801
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £127.46k £110.22k £72.29k £107.62k £141.55k
Total expenditure £91.66k £157.63k £129.67k £99.09k £56.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A