THE WESTMINSTER SCHOOL FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities have been aimed at receiving tax-efficient donations to enable the making of charitable grants to support education for the public benefit at or in connection with Westminster School. In future, the Charity plans to support projects such as the award of bursaries to enable 'needs-blind' admission, refurbishment of Little Dean's Yard and the new Sports Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 28 November 2011: Standard registration
- THE WESTMINSTER SCHOOL FOUNDATION (UK) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord David Edmond Neuberger | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELAINE POTTER | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.13k | £122.50k | £0 | £0 | £50 | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.81k | £125.80k | £7.42k | £6.65k | £8.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 December 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 SEP 2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING AND EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR AT WESTMINSTER SCHOOL; AND (B) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westminster School
Little Deans Yard
LONDON
SW1P 3PF
- Phone:
- 02079631111
- Website:
-
WWW.OLDWESTMINSTER.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window