Financial history The Literacy Pirates Limited

Charity number: 1145115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £254.32k £886.16k £1.07m £1.05m £1.05m
Total expenditure £144.14k £703.34k £881.41k £1.10m £1.15m
Income from government contracts N/A £23.94k £22.88k £87.05k £44.70k
Income from government grants N/A £100.72k £44.08k £6.03k £3.60k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £825.92k £1.00m £902.24k £947.71k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £13.45k £18.86k £16.47k £19.91k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £43.92k £46.18k £105.84k £51.00k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £425 £1.71k £17.10k £30.15k
Income - Other N/A £2.46k £300 £6.25k £4.06k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £10.00k £10.58k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £601.15k £734.35k £895.28k £971.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £102.19k £147.06k £208.98k £176.81k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.35k £5.59k £5.74k £7.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0