THE LIVING GOD CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conduct, organise or carry out the following: *Christian worship services and ceremonies *Prayer and fasting *Residential camps *Discipleship and leadership training *Evangelistic missions *Plant satellite churches *Prison outreaches (Philippines) *Spiritual care and advocacy *Christian music concerts *Sports and cultural events *Practical assistance to those in dire need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
- Throughout London
- Burma
- Netherlands
- Philippines
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 July 2012: Standard registration
- TLGC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maridane Seva RGN | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Genevieve Gutierrez | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Genevieve Barnett | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rex Arellano | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOEL JOSE RGN | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARCEL WAYNE FORONDA RGN | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRACE TOLERO RGN | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL MALLARE RGN | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.32k | £113.22k | £167.65k | £230.99k | £285.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.97k | £53.90k | £89.59k | £244.27k | £215.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK AND PHILIPPINES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A) CONDUCTING WORSHIP AND EVANGELISTIC SERVICES; B) THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION; C) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE; D) THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Munnings Close
Basingstoke
RG21 3EH
- Phone:
- 07853262319
- Email:
- tlgc777@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window