ZANZIBAR WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist in the relief of poverty and distress amongst people from Zanzibar another association members living in the United Kingdom and others in need in Zanzibar. To provide support on advancement of public education to all members of the association. To maintain and advance the Zanzibar culture and traditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 February 2012: Standard registration
- ZAWA UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HASSAN KHAMIS | Chair | 17 October 2011 |
|
|||||
SALIM AMAR SAAD | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|||||
KHALFAN MOHAMED AYOUB | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALI SAID | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAID AHMED AWADH | Trustee | 17 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £4.00k | £8.68k | £15.70k | £1.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.00k | £2.00k | £7.00k | £0 | £1.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 29/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED SHALL BE: (1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OF TANZANIA ORIGIN NOW LIVING IN THE UK BY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; (C) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH; AND (D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE TANZANIA AND ZANZIBAR CULTURE AND TRADITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
233 Convent Way
Southall
UB2 5UH
- Phone:
- 02088936151
- Email:
- info@zawauk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window