Financial history AFGHAN SOCIETY IN THE WEST MIDLANDS

Charity number: 1144725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.94k £42.68k £40.77k £46.81k £35.12k
Total expenditure £30.45k £24.34k £35.54k £45.26k £33.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.67k £2.36k N/A N/A