Financial history PARMARTH SADHNA CHARITABLE TRUST UK

Charity number: 1147770
Charity reporting is up to date (197 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £37.94k £31.75k £35.84k £43.48k £33.48k
Total expenditure £30.17k £28.39k £34.38k £23.21k £27.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A