THEKENILWORTHCENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide activities and facilities for residents of Kenilworth and its surrounding areas with a particular emphasis on provision for young people to help them develop their capabilities and grow to full maturity as individuals and members of the community, and to achieve this by establishing, maintaining and managing a community centre for such activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,244 from 7 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 03 November 2011: Standard registration
- THE KENILWORTH CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL BRIGGS | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
SIMEON CONNOR | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR REBECCA EDYTHE JOHNSON | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
NICHOIAS CADD | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Helen Victoria Meir | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Anderson | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Robin Leach | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Graham | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MANDY BROUGHAM | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.36k | £111.27k | £112.52k | £114.57k | £158.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.54k | £107.30k | £125.20k | £139.48k | £153.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.95k | £38.67k | £19.88k | £12.80k | £20.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 OCT 2011
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF KENILWORTH AND SURROUNDING AREAS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER RESIDENTS, STATUTORY, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, WHICH ADVANCE EDUCATION AND SUPPORT, AS WELL AS RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, ALL WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING SOCIAL WELFARE, AND THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR RESIDENTS, AND TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES AND GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY. TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Randall Road
KENILWORTH
Kenilworth
CV8 1JX
- Phone:
- 01926 855205
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window