Accounts and annual returns ROSEBERY SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1145915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 November 2021 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required