Financial history NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE MUSIC CENTRE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1145059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £59.34k £56.71k £28.32k £40.10k £47.67k
Total expenditure £64.75k £64.75k £31.50k £51.18k £63.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.77k £17.67k £17.10k £19.00k N/A