Financial history FRIENDS OF FRITCHLEY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1144192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.31k £2.90k £2.78k £7.83k £5.88k
Total expenditure £4.60k £1.83k £148 £3.79k £4.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A