PAIN UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pain UK is working to influence the way pain is dealt with in the NHS, the workplace and society. As an umbrella organisation we are building a stronger voice representing those living with pain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £469 | £4.69k | £3.80k | £3.80k | £21.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.04k | £3.14k | £6.31k | £6.31k | £5.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 16 September 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 19 September 2019 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED ON 27 JUN 2018 as amended on 22 May 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF PEOPLE IN PAIN, IN PARTICULAR BY BRINGING TOGETHER VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF PAIN SUFFERERS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO IMPROVE THEIR CARE, TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ON THE CAUSES, EFFECTS, TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF PAIN; AND (C)TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE LIVING WITH PAIN WHO MAY BE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF POOR MANAGEMENT OF THEIR CONDITION AND THE PHYSICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL AND SOCIAL PROBLEMS THAT CAN ENSUE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window