Accounts and annual returns THE KING'S SCHOOL CHESTER ROWING CLUB PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1144420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 01 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 13 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 13 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 01 June 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required