Financial history PORT TALBOT MUSICAL THEATRE

Charity number: 502281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £12.01k £2.40k £1.18k £18.06k £19.46k
Total expenditure £8.18k £0 £240 £22.26k £23.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A