Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS FOR FRIENDS

Charity number: 1144346
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 28 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 06 March 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 30 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 27 February 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2012 17 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 07 June 2013 On Time