Financial history NEUADD BENTREF PANTPERTHOG (PANTPERTHOG VILLAGE HALL)

Charity Number: 502283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.20k £10.81k £2.23k £5.10k £3.02k
Total expenditure £2.72k £2.49k £2.01k £3.64k £7.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A