THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD CHAPEL OF VICTORY MILTON KEYNES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith worldwide in accordance with the doctrine set out in the statement of faith to relieve person who are in need, hardship or distress and to educate in accordance with the Christian principles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 11 October 2011: Standard registration
- RCCG CHAPEL OF VICTORY MILTON KEYNES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABAYOMI OLUGBENGA DADA | Trustee | 11 October 2011 |
|
|||||
IDOWU ADENIKE AIYEOLA | Trustee | 11 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.98k | £58.78k | £43.91k | £64.48k | £82.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.24k | £50.20k | £32.61k | £33.42k | £50.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 11 October 2021 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 11 October 2021 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 04 September 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 04 September 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04/10/2011
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE. 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Kempton Drive
TOWCESTER
Northamptonshire
NN12 6NG
- Phone:
- 07872444123
- Email:
- CHAPELOVICTORY@YAHOO.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window