HOLLY TREES FUNDRAISERS

Charity Number: 1144665
Charity reporting is up to date (119 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Organise and run fundraising activities to provide additional equipment, facilities and experiences for the pupils of the School and which will bring together the whole community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £32,571
Total expenditure: £34,252

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 November 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucy Young Chair 29 January 2025
None on record
Nurian Eliana Medina Criollo Trustee 29 January 2025
None on record
Natalie Nottage Trustee 10 January 2024
None on record
Sarah Day Trustee 10 January 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £19.46k £15.03k £8.99k £32.68k £32.57k
Total expenditure £8.44k £8.90k £8.57k £15.56k £34.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 October 2024 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 27 October 2024 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 19 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 19 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Holly Trees Primary School
Vaughan Williams Way
Warley
Brentwood
CM14 5RY
Phone:
01277212296