YOPEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We set up and run YOPEY Dementia Befriender partnerships. These are befriending partnerships between ourselves, schools or colleges and care homes. We inspire, train and support young people, known as YOPEY Befrienders, to befriend elderly residents, especially those living with dementia. We get positive publicity for our YOPEY Befrienders, ourselves and the other partners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 January 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Gearing MBE | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Sheppard | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gracie Jane McLaven | Trustee | 14 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS SAMUEL ABBOTT | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE GALAZKA | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.28k | £75.52k | £55.67k | £55.28k | £19.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.59k | £66.59k | £81.19k | £79.45k | £41.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 AUG 2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP THROUGH THE RECOGNITION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AS POSITIVE ROLE MODELS IN SOCIETY, BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND ADMINISTRATION OF A PROGRAMME OF AWARDS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OR LOANS, AND OTHER SUPPORTING ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodfarm Cottage
Bury Road
Stradishall
Newmarket
CB8 8YN
- Phone:
- 01440821654
- Email:
- hello@yopey.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window