CHRIST UNIVERSAL GOSPEL MINISTRIES A FAMILY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Every Sunday Praise & Worship services Hold regular Bible Study meetings and prayer meetings. Hold healing services, baptisms, weddings, Holy Communion and other services. Hold evangelistic crusades by way of seminars, conferences, open-air meetings, tract printing and distribution and other methods deemed fit and acceptable to the church and it's teachings of Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 11 January 2012: Standard registration
- CHRIST UNIVERSAL GOSPEL MINISTRIES (Working name)
- CHRIST UNIVERSAL GOSPEL MINISTRIES CHERUBIM & SERAPHIM CHURCH (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR MS ADETOUN ISIKALU BA HONS | Trustee | 11 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELDER MOSES AKINNADEJU HND | Trustee | 11 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
OLUSOLA SULEIMON | Trustee | 11 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR TUNDE SOMUYIWA BA HONS | Trustee | 11 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROPHETESS OLUKEMI ELESIN | Trustee | 11 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MS ELI JEKAIYE BSC | Trustee | 11 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ABIOLA AKINPELU BSC | Trustee | 11 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.09k | £17.59k | £23.55k | £24.59k | £24.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.17k | £8.58k | £22.51k | £20.17k | £22.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/11/2008 AS AMENDED ON 08/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 06/05/2012
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROMULGATING THE TEACHINGS OF CHRIST, EVANGELISING IN THE POWER OF THE HOLY SPIRIT AND PROVIDING PASTORAL CARE. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ALL SCHOOL AGE CHILDREN WITHIN THE RESIDENTS BOROUGH OF THE CHURCH AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 NORTH DOWNS ROAD
NEW ADDINGTON
CROYDON
CR0 0LE
- Phone:
- 01689845640
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window