DORSET SEARCH DOGS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dorset Search Dogs uses dogs to help the police and other statutory bodies search for missing people in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Poole
- Somerset
- Surrey
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 17 January 2012: Standard registration
- DSD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Weller | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Serena Field | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Smith | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
andrew edwards | Trustee | 16 April 2020 |
|
|||||
MATTHEW COOKE | Trustee | 11 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.28k | £29.16k | £2.43k | £21.75k | £15.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.82k | £13.00k | £5.04k | £26.74k | £12.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 FEB 2006 AS AMENDED ON 12/01/2012 as amended on 12 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND LIFE BY THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTEER SEARCH AND RESCUE DOGS TO ASSIST IN THE SEARCH AND RESCUE OF MISSING PERSONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O DORSET POLICE
BOURNEMOUTH POLICE STATION
5 MADEIRA ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH1 1QQ
- Phone:
- 01202 222222
- Email:
- info@dorsetsearchdogs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window