SIERRA LEONE GRAMMAR SCHOOL OLD BOYS ASSOCIATION FOUNDATION TRUST (UK) SLGSOBA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SLGSOBA (UK) supports the educational development of its alma mater, through scholarships, grants, sports for leisure time occupation, IT equipment to help in the development of the pupils knowledge of computer and internet. To create and deliver projects with strong enterprise nature for sustainability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout London
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 07 March 2012: Standard registration
- SIERRA LEONE GRAMMAR SCHOOL OLD BOYS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- SLGSOBA (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victor Ronald Kwaku Johnson | Chair | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL EDWIN GUSMOND DOHERTY | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Henry Williams | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Olayiwole Edwin | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JESSE RICHARDS | Trustee | 14 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROWLAND GORDON | Trustee | 17 October 2011 |
|
|||||
MOHAMED KAMARA-KOLLEH | Trustee | 17 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.68k | £39.66k | £42.81k | £90.61k | £115.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.62k | £43.15k | £32.17k | £68.24k | £137.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 20 January 2025 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 20 January 2025 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 06 October 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 07 October 2021 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 30 September 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 30 September 2020 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/03/2012 as amended on 11 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUPILS OF THE SIERRA LEONE GRAMMAR SCHOOL IN FREETOWN, AND THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE ALUMNI LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, THE TRUSTEES WILL FURTHER THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIP GRANTS, PAYMENT OF FEES; TEACHING AID, LABORATORY AND RECREATION EQUIPMENT (B) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES; (D) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGES; (F) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE UNDER THE EXISTING LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND TO ANY NEW PURPOSES WHICH ARE SUBSEQUENTLY RECOGNISED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW.
Contact information
- Address:
-
128 CITY ROAD
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07949211859
- Email:
- secgen@regentonians.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window