Financial history MOUNT HOREB UNITED CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST (APOSTOLIC) BETHEL UK

Charity Number: 1146007
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.11k £24.17k £28.71k £37.85k £39.47k
Total expenditure £20.55k £13.79k £15.68k £28.52k £23.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A