VINE ACCESS CENTRES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a means of engaging young people in constructive activities, thereby keeping them away from criminal behaviour. Positively promoting young people in order to change the negative perception of young people in general. Specialist Guidance Recognising that young people need support in making informed decisions for life including: choices for work, training, lifestyles and faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 08 November 2011: Standard registration
- 06 January 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.30k | £97.30k | £142.36k | £0 | £1.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.24k | £105.08k | £100.47k | £933 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 July 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 September 2020 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 04 September 2019 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 04 September 2019 | 66 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (ÔÇ£THE OBJECTSÔÇØ): 4.1. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF LEISURE, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF:- 4.1.1. ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; 4.1.2. ADVANCING EDUCATION; 4.1.3. RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; AND 4.1.4. PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS; AND 4.2. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window