Financial history STEPPING STONES COMMUNITY ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1145346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £123.07k £198.50k £227.89k £236.33k £398.50k
Total expenditure £114.84k £180.07k £185.37k £197.82k £387.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £44.65k N/A
Income from government grants £83.07k £155.59k £53.30k £137.46k £381.93k