THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE LOUGHBOROUGH HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund-raising to support patients and nurses of Loughborough Hospital and periodically visiting wards to visit patients with gifts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 09 April 1973: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF LOUGHBOROUGH HOSPITAL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAUREEN BLOCK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sally Carvell | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE BARRADELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH COPESTAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAT TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.31k | £2.58k | £2.67k | £11.87k | £15.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.18k | £618 | £1.37k | £1.18k | £6.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
OBJECTS AND RULES AS AMENDED 22ND FEBRUARY 1973.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE LOUGHBOROUGH HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND TO GENERALLY SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LOUGHBOROUGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 Sandalwood Road
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE11 3PS
- Phone:
- 07941300982
- Email:
- maureen.block@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window