The British Society of Master Glass Painters Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Publication of the annual journal and quarterly newsletters, maintenance of the library, organisation of the annual conference and quarterly programme of lectures and walks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 2011: Standard registration
- THE BSMGP TRUST (Working name)
- STAINED GLASS ARTS TRUST (Previous name)
- THE BRITISH SOCIETY OF MASTER GLASS PAINTERS' CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Edgworth Benyon Hon FMGP | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN LEWIS HARRISON HON FMGP | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER DANIEL CORMACK Hon FMGP | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Paul Bambrough FMGP | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Margaret Mulligan | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|||||
MRS SUE SHAUGHNESSY | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PHILLIP TAYLOR BA, FMGP | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BARRY CLARE ACR FMGP | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS CHRIS WYARD | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.49k | £31.87k | £45.32k | £42.73k | £55.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.75k | £39.99k | £39.22k | £53.32k | £51.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/12/2011 AS AMENDED ON 23 JUN 2017 as amended on 28 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE HISTORY, ART, PRODUCTION AND CONSERVATION OF STAINED, PAINTED, ETCHED, FUSED, ENGRAVED, STRUCTURAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND ALL OTHER FORMS OF GLASS BY CONDUCTING RESEARCH, LECTURES, SEMINARS, CONFERENCES , EXHIBITIONS, VISITS AND ANY OTHER MEANS OF EXCHANGING INFORMATION BY: (A) THE PUBLISHING OF SPECIALIST JOURNALS, NEWSLETTERS AND OTHER RELATED PUBLICATIONS AND THE MAINTENANCE OF A LIBRARY; (B THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND GRANTS, AND ANY OTHER FORM OF EDUCATIONAL PROVISION OR SUPPORT, TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE ABLE TO DO SO, TO UNDERTAKE A COURSE OF STUDY; AND (C) THE SUPPORT OF TRAINING PROGRAMMES, INCLUDING APPRENTICESHIPS, IN THE ART AND CRAFT OF GLASS (WHETHER IN FORMAL EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS OR ELSEWHERE).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
P O BOX 15
MINEHEAD
SOMERSET
TA24 8ZX
- Phone:
- 01643862807
- Email:
- SECRETARY@BSMGP.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window