WHITTLESEY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary activity of the Church is to maintain the work of proclaiming the Gospel of Jesus Christ in the area, together with the care of the members of the church and congregation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 08 November 2011: Standard registration
- WBC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Ian Kosciecha | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND JOHN BAXTER | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Joseph King | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Sayer | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Johnson | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Busby | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Philpott | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.82k | £102.74k | £99.36k | £104.63k | £110.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.17k | £81.33k | £90.97k | £97.17k | £102.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £3.25k | £150 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/07/2011
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO BAPTIST PRINCIPLES AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH AS STATED IN SCHEDULE 1. THE CHARITY MAY ALSO CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Gracious Street
Whittlesey
PETERBOROUGH
PE7 1AR
- Phone:
- 01733 202236
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window