BUMBA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bumba Foundation is a small UK registered charity which provides sustainable education opportunities for children, young people and communities in vulnerable areas of Uganda through innovative projects with community ownership. The projects focus on providing access to quality education, improving health & sanitation, reducing poverty, whilst increasing individual and community sustainability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Uganda
Governance
- 25 January 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Tilbury MBE | Chair | 06 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Aidan Dawson | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dane Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Purvis-Turton | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Solesbury MBE | Trustee | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE HANSON CIPD OC | Trustee | 06 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.24k | £50.51k | £56.10k | £52.10k | £72.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.45k | £46.40k | £54.17k | £58.30k | £66.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/10/2011 AS AMENDED ON 24/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROMOTION OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF YOUNG PEOPLE SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPACITIES AND ENABLE THEM TO BECOME RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED IN UGANDA AND THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND WITH THE AIM TO IMPROVE AND INCREASE COMMUNITY COHESION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. BY COMMUNITY COHESION WE MEAN WORKING TOWARDS A SOCIETY IN WHICH: • THERE IS A COMMON VISION AND SENSE OF BELONGING BY ALL COMMUNITIES • THE DIVERSITY OF PEOPLE'S BACKGROUNDS AND CIRCUMSTANCES IS APPRECIATED AND VALUED • SIMILAR LIFE OPPORTUNITIES ARE AVAILABLE TO ALL, AND • STRONG AND POSITIVE RELATIONSHIPS EXIST AND CONTINUE TO BE DEVELOPED IN THE WORKPLACE, IN SCHOOLS AND IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
UGANDA AND THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Dane Road
Sale
M33 7AR
- Phone:
- 01619732786
- Email:
- Bumbafoundation@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window