Trustees BUMBA FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1145624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Tilbury MBE Chair 06 November 2011
None on record
Aidan Dawson Trustee 13 August 2024
None on record
Dane Smith Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
James Purvis-Turton Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Wendy Solesbury MBE Trustee 15 November 2015
None on record
JANE HANSON CIPD OC Trustee 06 November 2011
None on record