Accounts and annual returns TEWKESBURY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1145209
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 February 2017 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 16 February 2017 16 days late
Annual return 31 March 2015 18 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 18 September 2015 On Time