CYMDEITHAS MAES CHWARAE LLANSILIN (LLANSILIN PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improving the communities play amenities through installating more play equiptment. We manage the local recycling site, income generated helps to maintain the socal recreational facilities for people of all ages and abilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 27 June 1975: Standard registration
- LLANSILIN PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- LLANSILIN PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- LPFA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE ROSE WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GORONWAY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.98k | £18 | £16 | £21 | £194 | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.39k | £0 | £16 | £61 | £162 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2025 | 356 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2023 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LLANSILIN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITHE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FUTHER DETAILS SEE RULES).
Area of benefit
LLANSILIN AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 MAESYLLAN
LLANSILIN
OSWESTRY
SY10 7QE
- Phone:
- 01691791563
- Email:
- WILLIAMS786@TALKTALK.NET
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window