Financial history ENGINEERING EDUCATION SCHEME WALES LIMITED

Charity number: 1144651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £710.26k £528.85k £718.24k £887.99k £490.87k
Total expenditure £662.56k £459.99k £656.90k £839.66k £550.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £14.94k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £586.51k £448.82k £440.91k £732.07k £253.11k
Income - Donations and legacies £15.49k £10.68k £1.07k £5.20k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £717.18k £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £681.78k £516.37k £0 £882.79k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £13.00k £1.79k £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £662.56k £459.99k £656.90k £839.66k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.20k £4.33k £4.50k £4.50k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A