AFTER CARE SOBER SOLUTIONS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity is that of providing care for clients recovering from the misuse of alcohol. Our intention is to create a safe, comfortable and inviting 15 bed home for people who are willing and committed to leading a new alcohol free life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 January 2012: Standard registration
- 23 August 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ACSS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.45k | £72.15k | £75.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.10k | £88.13k | £93.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 11 February 2015 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 11 February 2015 | 11 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 02 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 02 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/01/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE RECOVERING FROM THE MISUSE OF ALCOHOL THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF A RESIDENTIAL CARE FACILITY AND SUPPORT TO GET BACK INTO EMPLOYMENT. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE DANGERS AND EFFECTS OF ALCOHOL MISUSE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window