HALLINGBURY SCOUT AND GUIDE SUPPORTERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The support by financial and other means the Scout and Guide movements in the Hallingbury villages in Essex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 08 June 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CLIFF PEDDER | Chair | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVE BRISTOW | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
BO HALIL | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
SALLY BENTLEY | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER WILLIAM GREEN FCA | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.07k | £8 | £2 | £77 | £2.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.41k | £398 | £333 | £355 | £1.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 April 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED ON 04/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT TO THE SCOUT AND GUIDE MOVEMENTS IN THE HALLINGBURY VILLAGES IN ESSEX.
Contact information
- Address:
-
High Spinney
Church Road
Great Hallingbury
Bishop's Stortford
CM22 7TZ
- Phone:
- 07434422172
- Email:
- CLIFF.PEDDER@TALK21.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window