FILIPINO WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide scholarship to indigent youth and support a school programme in the Philippines. In the UK charitable projects include support victims of domestic violence, support services for senior citizens of FWA-UK and the community. General Meeting in May, Annual General Meeting in September, fundraising activities include annual food festival, annual dinner dance in June.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
- Kent
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Philippines
Governance
- 25 May 2012: Standard registration
- FWA-UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LESLEY LAROCHE | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amor Bayudan | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Velly Cattermole | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Cabatic | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Celerina Grosser | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ira Lehmann | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Crystal Dias | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.31k | £3.80k | £11.19k | £21.44k | £13.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.58k | £11.49k | £17.24k | £5.90k | £21.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 18 February 2022 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 06 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/09/2011 AS AMENDED ON 13/05/2012 AS AMENDED ON 13 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE PHILIPPINES BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE PHILIPPINES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS AND IN PARTICULAR, WOMEN, TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 3) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF RECENT FILIPINO ARRIVALS TO THE UK FOR WHOM ENGLISH IS NOT THEIR FIRST LANGUAGE BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING DOMESTIC ABUSE, POVERTY OR SOCIAL ISOLATION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dias Solicitors
3 Waterhouse Square
138-142 Holborn
LONDON
EC1N 2SW
- Phone:
- 07928368400
- Email:
- contact@fwa-uk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window