Financial history THE B17 STEAM LOCOMOTIVE TRUST

Charity number: 1144738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £81.41k £124.40k £180.78k £174.05k £186.81k
Total expenditure £7.05k £91.70k £78.03k £4.17k £5.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A