Financial history BEENHAM SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1145381
Charity reporting is up to date (135 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £21.77k £15.88k £10.14k £12.35k £20.78k
Total expenditure £25.35k £20.37k £2.05k £4.12k £11.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A