ADVANCED SOCCER AND SPORTS ASSOCIATION (ASSA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON BY THE PROVISION OF COACHING AND TRAINING FOR FOOTBALL AND SUCH OTHER OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES THAT ARE CAPABLE OF PROMOTING HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO TENNIS, TABLE TENNIS, BADMINTON, ATHLETICS, CRICKET, HOCKEY. CYCLING, BASKETBALL, NETBALL AND MARTIAL ARTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MURAT YAKUP | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Warren Davis | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elvan Huseyin | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE ARROWSMITH | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.20k | £1.40k | £1.27k | £1.71k | £23.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.98k | £1.50k | £1.43k | £1.80k | £21.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 September 2021 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 July 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/12/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND TRAINING FOR FOOTBALL AND SUCH OTHER OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES THAT ARE CAPABLE OF PROMOTING HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO TENNIS, TABLE TENNIS, BADMINTON, ATHLETICS, CRICKET, HOCKEY. CYCLING, BASKETBALL, NETBALL AND MARTIAL ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Wood Street
Walthamstow
LONDON
E17 3HT
- Phone:
- 07738716045
- Email:
- assacharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window