THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LUKE, WEST HAMPSTEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC engages in the following activities: holding regular public worship open to all; pastoral work; teaching Christianity through sermons/small groups; taking religious assemblies in schools; the provision of youth clubs; the promotion of Christianity through the staging of events; promoting the mission of the Church through activities for various groups; and supporting Christian charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
Governance
- 29 November 2011: Previously excepted registration
- ST LUKE'S PCC, HAMPSTEAD (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. LUKE, WEST HAMPSTEAD (Previous name)
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ALISTAIR CHARLES TRESIDDER | Chair | 21 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stannard | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hackett | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derralynn Hughes | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Matejczyk | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tim Fairbairn | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Craig | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emilia Worth | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Philip Poulard | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Monica Duncan | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brandon Leung | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adam Farlow | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN BARRETT | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MARK JULIAN PARKER | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.91k | £159.20k | £205.59k | £243.40k | £225.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.53k | £211.47k | £177.49k | £223.60k | £255.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lukes Church
Kidderpore Avenue
LONDON
NW3 7SU
- Phone:
- 0207 431 6317
- Email:
- admin@stlukeshampstead.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window