WASPS LEGENDS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds for general charitable projects by means of using the contacts of the Wasps rugby family and in particular through events and general activities of former Wasps players from both the professional and amateur eras.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher John Kains Braithwaite | Chair | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lilidh Charlotte Matthews | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Roger Antony Spicer | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Gordon | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Nduva | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Kennaby Stanley | Trustee | 13 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Solomon N'Jie | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rogers | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER SCRIVENER | Trustee | 09 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £219.69k | £110.93k | £225.78k | £428.49k | £417.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.92k | £72.18k | £193.53k | £487.30k | £341.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/04/2012 as amended on 08 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
85 Great Portland Street
London
W1W 7LT
- Phone:
- 07540771424
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window