CROWN OF GLORY MINISTRIES (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are Christian based multinational church that teaches and practices the truth of the Gospel as obtaining in both the new and old testament. We engage in the fundamental teachings of equality of all races before God and the charge to extend love, forgiveness and selflessness in human living. We do this by fellowshiping, cultural and biblical celebrations of key festivals, training members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 March 2012: Standard registration
- COG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Munetsi Mandere | Chair | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
IDDO MPOFU | Trustee | 16 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
DORCAS NDLOVU | Trustee | 16 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER MASUKU Van Driver | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP NKOMAZANA CARER | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
LISTER NYATHI MASUKU | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
CLARA NDLOVU | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
EVA MANHANDO MANDERE Nurse | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.40k | £3.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.77k | £4.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 564 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 564 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 929 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 929 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1294 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1294 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1659 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1659 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCT 2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS) IN SUCH WAYS AND IN ALL THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE PASTORAL COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; TO ASSIST THE SICK AND CHURCH MEMBERS AND COMMUNITY MEMBERS IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIPS AS DEEMED FIT BY PASTORAL COUNCIL; TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE GOOD HEALTH STANDARDS BY PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CONSELLING AND SUPPORT IN ALL THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE PASTORAL COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT AND; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION TO THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY AND IN ALL PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE PASTORAL COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY SEE FIT;
Contact information
- Address:
-
224 LINDFIELD ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG8 6HR
- Phone:
- 01159987479
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window