IMAM MAHDI (A.S) ASSOCIATION- WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates in wolvehamton and the surrounding areas.It works to help the Afghani Shia muslims in wolverhamton and surrounding areas. We hold community mettings for special events and respond to the basic needs of the Afghani Shia Muslims in this area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 03 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yasin Rahimi | Chair | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Arif ahmadi | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Fahim | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wahed Nazari | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.56k | £10.80k | £11.76k | £12.50k | £17.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £820 | £2.55k | £10.50k | £4.20k | £18.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 14 February 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 17 March 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED ON 05/04/2012
Charitable objects
3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND RELIGIOUS CEREMONIES AND PROVISION OF SERVICES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SHIA SCHOOL OF THOUGHT; 3.1.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF,EDUCATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND COUNSELING, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF SPORTING ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; 3.1.3 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.1.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, SUPPLEMENTARY CLASSES, LANGUAGE CLASSES AND ANY SUCH ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME; 3.1.5 TO PROMOTE RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL AND FAITH GROUPS, IN WAYS THAT CREATES TRUST, UNITY AND PEACE BETWEEN THEM;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Former Council office
Imam Mahdi (A.S) Association
Lea Road
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV3 0LU
- Phone:
- 07365459689
- Email:
- IMAWOLVES@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window