NAMAL COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the people in Pakistan through : (1) The advancement of education, training and skills; (2) By supporting students (who have limited means of support) using scholarships which are merit / needs based. (3) Namal college aims to promote equal opportunities for students irrespective of gender (4) provide undergraduate prog with technical / practical skills
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Pakistan
Governance
- 02 December 2011: Standard registration
- NAMAL KNOWLEDGE CITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arshad Javed | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|||||||
TAHER NAWAZ MBA, FCA | Trustee | 02 December 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £632.30k | £56.96k | £122.00k | £23.78k | £34.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.31k | £600.26k | £38.24k | £110.79k | £168 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £632.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £310 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2023 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2022 | 516 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2022 | 516 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 DEC 2011
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND SKILLS IN PAKISTAN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO NAMAL COLLEGE AS A HIGH QUALITY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO STUDENTS ATTENDING THE COLLEGE, WITH A FOCUS ON THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PAKISTAN BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL SERVICES AND SUPPORT FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN PAKISTAN WHO ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED
Contact information
- Address:
-
T Nawaz & Co
Cambridge House
66 Little Horton Lane
BRADFORD
BD5 0HU
- Phone:
- 01274786111
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window