LEWISHAM AFGHAN COMMUNITY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN THE LOCAL AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM AND ITS ENVIRONS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION BELIEF (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY RECENT MIGRANT FROM AFGHANISTAN AND CENTRAL ASIA) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 05 February 2014: Standard registration
- DEPTFORD ISLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEZBULLAH SHINWARI | Chair | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROOHULLAH HAYATZADA | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHAPOOR SIDDIQUI | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
HAJI ZAKER SHINWARI | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.81k | £5.22k | £6.33k | £9.65k | £226 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.80k | £7.47k | £6.60k | £3.63k | £5.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 363 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 363 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 729 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 729 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 August 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/01/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM AND ITS ENVIRONS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, RECENT MIGRANTS FROM AFGHANISTAN AND CENTRAL ASIA) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY
Contact information
- Address:
-
151 BREAKSPEARS ROAD
LONDON
SE4 1TY
- Phone:
- 07824559025
- Email:
- Hezshinwari@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window