THE WHITLEY WILDLIFE CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1144633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE TRUST' IS CURRENTLY DORMANT PENDING A TRANSFER OF ASSETS FROM WHITLEY WILDLIFE CONSERVATION TRUST. IN TIME ITS PRINCIPAL ACTIVITY WILL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENTIFIC KNOWLEDGE, EDUCATION AND SCIENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ITS CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall
  • Devon
  • Torbay

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Cooper Chair 16 December 2021
SOUTH WEST ENVIRONMENTAL PARKS LIMITED
Received: On time
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
Melanie Skipp Trustee 11 September 2024
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
SOUTH WEST ENVIRONMENTAL PARKS LIMITED
Received: On time
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
JAMES O'DWYER Trustee 15 April 2024
SOUTH WEST ENVIRONMENTAL PARKS LIMITED
Received: On time
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
STOVER SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Ben Louis Jobson Trustee 12 February 2024
SOUTH WEST ENVIRONMENTAL PARKS LIMITED
Received: On time
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
Prof. Richard Preziosi Trustee 28 September 2022
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
SOUTH WEST ENVIRONMENTAL PARKS LIMITED
Received: On time
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
Beth Kathleen McLaughlin Trustee 22 October 2015
SOUTH WEST ENVIRONMENTAL PARKS LIMITED
Received: On time
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
SARAH BARR Trustee 01 August 2013
SOUTH WEST ENVIRONMENTAL PARKS LIMITED
Received: On time
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
ANDREW CHARLES JOHN COOPER BSC Trustee 10 November 2011
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
EAST DEVON PEBBLEBED HEATHS CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
SOUTH WEST ENVIRONMENTAL PARKS LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 18 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 02 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 29 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 22 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 23 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Paignton Zoo Environmental Park
Totnes Road
Paignton
TQ4 7EU
Phone:
01803 697503