THE BOWNESS TRUST

Charity number: 502323
Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General charitable purposes in Workington

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2019

Total income: £8,701
Total expenditure: £708

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 April 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW WHITE Trustee 23 January 2012
None on record
IAN GOSS CHAMBERS Trustee 23 January 2012
None on record
COLIN WILLIAM DOORBAR Trustee
None on record
RICHARD ATKINSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Total gross income £7.46k £7.46k £8.47k £8.38k £8.70k
Total expenditure £3.05k £4.42k £684 £684 £708
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Milburns
OXFORD HOUSE
21-23 Oxford Street
WORKINGTON
CA14 2AL
Phone:
0190067363
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available