PARKVIEW LODGE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a non profit making Pre-School educating children between the ages of 2-5 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORRAINE ALLOWAY | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE ANN LEWIS | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Galina Konova | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.12k | £52.21k | £99.51k | £104 | £105.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.59k | £67.26k | £67.38k | £109 | £85.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2019
(These accounts |
15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/10/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL (ÔÇ£THE OBJECTSÔÇØ) ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY:- 1) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; 2) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS; 3) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parkview Lodge Pre=School
Senior Street
LONDON
W2 5TL
- Phone:
- 02072896714
- Email:
- PARKVIEW.WPLAUK@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window